This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/13/2022 at 21:06:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BARNES, CAREENA ERICA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARNES, CAREENA ERICA. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

BARNES, CAREENA ERICA SABRINA

BARNES, CAREENA ERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

5/9/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

5/9/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-026261

5/9/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-026261

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

5/9/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

5/9/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

5/9/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

5/10/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

5/11/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF005402NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 22-026261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 06/17/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK