This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/07/2022 at 21:01:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BARI, ROBERT A Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARI, ROBERT A. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

BARI, ROBERT ALLEN

PROVENZANO, DOMINICK ANTHONY

BARI, ROBERT A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLINGHAM, MATT

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

GLOVER, JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE - SENT

7/1/2022: CORRESPONDENCE - SENT

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

6/29/2022: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

PAYMENT $954.52 RECEIPT #2022056378

6/24/2022: PAYMENT $954.52 RECEIPT #2022056378

SENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM

6/23/2022: SENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM

JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022106570)

6/23/2022: JUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022106570)

ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

6/20/2022: ORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

AMENDED COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

6/16/2022: AMENDED COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

JUDGMENT - RESTITUTION - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022102173)

6/15/2022: JUDGMENT - RESTITUTION - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022102173)

AMENDED ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY - IMMEDIATE JAIL INCARCERATION ORDERED

6/15/2022: AMENDED ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY - IMMEDIATE JAIL INCARCERATION ORDERED

ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY - IMMEDIATE JAIL INCARCERATION ORDERED

6/15/2022: ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY - IMMEDIATE JAIL INCARCERATION ORDERED

SCORESHEET

6/15/2022: SCORESHEET

ACKNOWLEDGMENT WAIVER OF RIGHTS

6/15/2022: ACKNOWLEDGMENT WAIVER OF RIGHTS

APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITHOUT A BOND

6/15/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD DISPOSITION WITHOUT A BOND

INFORMATION

6/14/2022: INFORMATION

NOTICE OF HEARING

6/14/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/2/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/2/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/2/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3B; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE - SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND PAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $954.52 RECEIPT #2022056378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2022106570)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CHARGE/COST/FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketSENTENCE / SPECIAL PROVISIONS FORM - PROPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketJUDGMENT CREATED AND FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COURT APPEARANCE RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-46228

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 07/08/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3B , JDG: CURLEY, ROCHELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN