This case was last updated from Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County on 02/27/2020 at 18:02:44 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS BARCOMB, SHERRY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BARCOMB, SHERRY. This case was filed in Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Twelfth Circuit Courts - Sarasota County

  • Courthouse:

    Sarasota County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

DRISCOLL, SHERI L

BARCOME, SHERI

BARCOME, SHERRI LYNN

BARCOME, SHERI L

BARCOMB, SHERRY

BARCOME, SHERRIE

DRISCOLL, SHERI LYNN

BARCUM, SHERRI

BARCOME, SHERI LYN

BARCOME, SHERI LYNN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

DAVY, AMANDA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/24/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

2/24/2020: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

2/21/2020: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

2/19/2020: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

2/18/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

2/18/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

WARRANT EXECUTED

2/18/2020: WARRANT EXECUTED

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

2/18/2020: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

2/12/2020: ORDER REVOKING PRETRIAL RELEASE

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

2/3/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

2/3/2020: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

WITNESS STATEMENT

2/3/2020: WITNESS STATEMENT

WITNESS STATEMENT

2/3/2020: WITNESS STATEMENT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

2/3/2020: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 20-1034

2/3/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 20-1034

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

2/3/2020: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

2/3/2020: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

2/3/2020: PRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM JAIL; Description:CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM JAIL; Description:CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • HearingTime:09:00 AM; Location:COURTROOM 3A; Description:CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL - BOND HEARING SET FOR 03/25/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN JAIL , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION TO MODIFY BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET EVENT: CRIMINAL - BOND HEARING DATE: Mar 25 2020 9:00AM JUDGE: PADAR, DONNA LOCATION: JACS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2020CF001270NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT 20-1034

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES RULES

    Read MoreRead Less