This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/30/2022 at 18:03:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS APARICIO MARQUEZ, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against APARICIO MARQUEZ, CARLOS. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

APARICIO MARQUEZ, CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

GLOVER, JONATHAN

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT (SSO 22-41603)

6/6/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT (SSO 22-41603)

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/6/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/8/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/8/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/8/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/8/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

WARRANT EXECUTED

6/8/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/9/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

6/10/2022: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 3A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF006350NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 07/15/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 3A , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022002862 - ARREST WARRANT (CRIMINAL) - CURRENT STATUS: EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: TOTAL; Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • FinancialFee Description: INDIGENCY CIRCUIT CASE APPROVED (F.S. 27.52); Total Fee: $50.00; Amount Paid: $0.00; Waived Amount: $0.00; Amount Outstanding: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022002862 - ARREST WARRANT (CRIMINAL) - ISSUED: CHARGE ONLY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT (SSO 22-41603)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLOVER, JONATHAN