This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/24/2022 at 21:07:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ANDREWS, ANTHONY LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ANDREWS, ANTHONY LAWRENCE. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ANDREWS, ANTHONY LAWRENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, AMANDA

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-16456

7/21/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-16456

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/21/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/21/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/21/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

7/21/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/21/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

BOND - PAPER POWER NO. OSI 16-10016761

7/25/2022: BOND - PAPER POWER NO. OSI 16-10016761

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPAION IN DISCOVERY

7/26/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPAION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

7/28/2022: NOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

8/12/2022: NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY; Court Result: CANC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT DATE CREATED AND ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPAION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - PAPER POWER NO. OSI 16-10016761

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF007891NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SSO#22-16456

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK