This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/22/2022 at 21:02:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS AARDEN RENDON, LINDA BARBARA

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against AARDEN RENDON, LINDA BARBARA. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

AARDEN RENDON, LINDA BARBARA

AARDEN, LINDA BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, AMANDA

Defendant Attorneys

SIDDALL, ROBERT

RUHL, RICHARD

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

LUX, SEAN

ADAMS, MARK

 

Court Documents

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

6/17/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/17/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/20/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

6/20/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

WARRANT EXECUTED

6/20/2022: WARRANT EXECUTED

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/20/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/20/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/20/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/22/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

APPLICATION FOR INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

6/28/2022: APPLICATION FOR INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; REQUEST TO INSPECT; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

6/28/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY; REQUEST TO INSPECT; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

WRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

7/5/2022: WRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/20/2022)

7/19/2022: INFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/20/2022)

APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

7/22/2022: APPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

7/22/2022: ORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2022
  • HearingTime: 01:30 PM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - CASE MANAGEMENT SET FOR 09/14/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 4B , JDG: PADAR, DONNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - CASE MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE RECORD CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY; REQUEST TO INSPECT; DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY SET FOR 07/22/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN 4A , JDG: KRUG, THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022003105 - ARREST WARRANT (CRIMINAL) - CURRENT STATUS: EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketWARRANT # 222022003105 - ARREST WARRANT (CRIMINAL) - ISSUED: CHARGE ONLY BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketARREST WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUX, SEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIDDALL, ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK