This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/21/2022 at 21:01:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS AARDEN, LINDA BARBARA

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against AARDEN, LINDA BARBARA. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PADAR, DONNA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PADAR, DONNA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

AARDEN, LINDA BARBARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS, AMANDA

Defendant Attorneys

SIDDALL, ROBERT

RUHL, RICHARD

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

ADAMS, MARK

LUX, SEAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

7/19/2022: NOTICE OF CASE ACTION

INFORMATION - AMENDED (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/20/2022)

7/19/2022: INFORMATION - AMENDED (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/20/2022)

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/11/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

7/8/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

7/8/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

7/8/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

7/8/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

7/8/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

WRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

7/5/2022: WRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

6/28/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

SPPLIVSNYION FOR INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

6/28/2022: SPPLIVSNYION FOR INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/28/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

6/22/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

6/17/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

6/17/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

6/17/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

6/17/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

6/17/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4A; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION 2022 CF 007388 NC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION - AMENDED (PAPER VERSION FILED 07/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketSPR RELEASE BOND 2022CF007388NC POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY, REQUEST TO INSPECT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSPPLIVSNYION FOR INFORMATION AND/OR COPY OF CHARGING DOCUMENT AND/OR INDICTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUX, SEAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIDDALL, ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMS, MARK