This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2022 at 21:01:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, JUAN CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENE, JORDAN

Defendant Attorneys

VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

BAEZ, JOHN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/19/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

CITATION AGUUB7E

8/19/2022: CITATION AGUUB7E

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

8/19/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/19/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/19/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/19/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/19/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/23/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

CITATION - AGUUB7E

8/25/2022: CITATION - AGUUB7E

INFORMATION

8/31/2022: INFORMATION

PUBLIC DEFEBDER'S MOTION'S TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

9/8/2022: PUBLIC DEFEBDER'S MOTION'S TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

9/9/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFEBDER'S MOTION'S TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - AGUUB7E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION (PAPER VERSION FILED ON 9/1/22)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION - AGUUB7E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketADD SENT TO TCATS - AGUUB7E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION AGUUB7E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketCITATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VELASQUEZ, ROSEMARIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN