This case was last updated from Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/22/2022 at 21:00:42 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Sarasota County - Twelfth Judicial Circuit Court, Sarasota County Courthouse located in Sarasota, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURLEY, ROCHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Sarasota, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURLEY, ROCHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WARD, SHARAINA LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VERES, PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

OFFICE OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

LOCKE, RETLEY

PUBLIC DEFENDER'S OFFICE

BAEZ, JOHN

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

8/18/2022: ORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-44384

8/18/2022: PROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-44384

PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

8/18/2022: PUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

8/18/2022: ADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

8/19/2022: ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

8/19/2022: PRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

ADVISORY HEARING BOND

8/19/2022: ADVISORY HEARING BOND

PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

8/23/2022: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

9/16/2022: NOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

INFORMATION

9/16/2022: INFORMATION

MOTION - TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

9/19/2022: MOTION - TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

9/19/2022: ORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

9/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION - TO WITHDRAW

9/21/2022: MOTION - TO WITHDRAW

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingTime: 09:00 AM; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Description: CRIMINAL - ARRAIGNMENT FELONY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO WITHDRAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - PLEA OF DENIAL, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY, DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER WITHDRAWING ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - TO WITHDRAW AND REQUEST FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF REGIONAL COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE DISPOSITION/ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING BOND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SERVICES BOND DETERMINATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY HEARING CONTINUANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPUBLIC RECORDS EXEMPTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE AFFIDAVIT - SPD#22-44384

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NOTICE TO APPEAR CRIMINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOCKE, RETLEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAEZ, JOHN