This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 13:05:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ZENATY, AMANDA MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ZENATY, AMANDA MARIE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********293A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ZENATY, AMANDA MARIE

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

BOND ESTREATURE SIGNED & ISSUED - BOND#: X60409151

07/10/2020: BOND ESTREATURE SIGNED & ISSUED - BOND#: X60409151

RECEIPT 2020-168-008954 DISTRIBUTED TO 2 UFNS, TOTAL $507.00 PAID

07/16/2020: RECEIPT 2020-168-008954 DISTRIBUTED TO 2 UFNS, TOTAL $507.00 PAID

RECEIPT 2020-168-008970 BOND X60409151, $507.00 PAID

07/16/2020: RECEIPT 2020-168-008970 BOND X60409151, $507.00 PAID

MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

04/27/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAY 01, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

03/24/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAY 01, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

02/18/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED - NOTICE TO APPEAR

02/18/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED - NOTICE TO APPEAR

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (4)

02/20/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (4)

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC SCHOTT

02/12/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC SCHOTT

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/05/2020

02/05/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/05/2020

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409152

02/06/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409152

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

01/19/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409152 - AMT: $263 - NAME: SANFORD TROPIC

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409152 - AMT: $263 - NAME: SANFORD TROPIC

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409151 - AMT: $500 - NAME: SANFORD TROPIC

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409151 - AMT: $500 - NAME: SANFORD TROPIC

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 12, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/23/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 12, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BLAISE TRETTIS

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BLAISE TRETTIS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/16/2020; Receipt Number: 287694; Amount: $507.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/16/2020; Receipt Number: 287023; Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/16/2020; Receipt Number: 287023; Amount: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT 2020-168-008970 BOND X60409151, $507.00 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT *2020-168-008954 DISTRIBUTED TO 2 UFNS, TOTAL ($507.00) PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND ESTREATURE/CLERK FEE PAID - BOND#: X60409151 - AMT: $507 - DATE: 07/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT 2020-168-008954 DISTRIBUTED TO 2 UFNS, TOTAL $507.00 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND ESTREATURE SIGNED & ISSUED - BOND#: X60409151

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 07/09/2020 / 0230 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: BOND - X60409151; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $507.00; Interest: $0.00; Last Paid: 07/16/2020; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $507.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 877.03 - DISTURBING PEACE- BREACH OF THE PEACE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 877.03 - DISTURBING PEACE- BREACH OF THE PEACE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 877.03 - DISTURBING PEACE- BREACH OF THE PEACE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750 DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPERT; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 5000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less