This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/17/2020 at 09:12:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WILLIAMS, DONTYRELL NAQUAN

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, DONTYRELL NAQUAN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCINTOSH, DONNA L and SOUTO, MELISSA D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********407A

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCINTOSH, DONNA L

SOUTO, MELISSA D.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, DONTYRELL NAQUAN

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLK, JACOB

101 Bush Blvd

Sanford, FL 32773

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

MCCLANAHAN JR, A. A.

P O Box 667

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE MELISSA D. SOUTO

07/21/2020: MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE MELISSA D. SOUTO

AMENDED MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY FOR COSTS

07/26/2020: AMENDED MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY FOR COSTS

ORDER GRANTING DEF'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF PARTIAL INDIGENCY

07/26/2020: ORDER GRANTING DEF'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF PARTIAL INDIGENCY

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

06/23/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

05/26/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

04/17/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

04/20/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (5)

04/22/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (5)

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

04/07/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L MCINTOSH

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 27, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

04/08/2020: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 27, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

03/23/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY A.A.MCCLANAHAN HR

03/03/2020: NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY A.A.MCCLANAHAN HR

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

03/03/2020: MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/03/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 03/04/2020

03/04/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 03/04/2020

PRAECIPE FOR DEPOSITION (1)

02/18/2020: PRAECIPE FOR DEPOSITION (1)

NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS PUBLIC DEFENDER

02/17/2020: NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS PUBLIC DEFENDER

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/12/2020

02/13/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/12/2020

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 09/02/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SOUTO, MELISSA D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTORNEY RE: PROPOSED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEF'S MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF PARTIAL INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF INDIGENCY FOR COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE MELISSA D. SOUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket--DEFENDANT RETURNED TO CUSTODY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(1)ATTEMPTED ROBBERY WITH A DEADLY WEAPON 812.13(2)(A) 777.04(4)(C) F-2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket--SOUTO, MELISSA D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCANCEL DOCKET SOUNDING FOR 08/05/2020 AT 0900AM IN COURTROOM 5A BEFORE JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCONTINUED PER THE COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 02/13/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - STATUS: NOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/24/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 03/04/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(1) - LARC-- GRAND THEFT IS $750 LESS THAN $5000 DOLS DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(1) - LARC-- GRAND THEFT IS $750 LESS THAN $5000 DOLS; OFFENSE DATE: 01/24/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(1) - LARC-- GRAND THEFT IS $750 LESS THAN $5000 DOLS; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 03/04/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE FELONY - 812.13(2)(A) - ATTEMPTED ROBBERY WITH A DEADLY WEAPON DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE FELONY - 812.13(2)(A) - ROBBERY- WITH FIREARM; OFFENSE DATE: 01/24/2020; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: NO BOND; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE FELONY - 812.13(2)(A) - ATTEMPTED ROBBERY WITH A DEADLY WEAPON, 777.04(4)(C)-CRIMINAL ATTEMPT SOLICIT CONSPIRE 1ST DEG FEL; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 03/04/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less