This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:07:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WILLIAMS, DE'VONN JAHIEM ANDREVIO

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, DE'VONN JAHIEM ANDREVIO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********052A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

WILLIAMS, DEVONN JAHIEM ANDREVIO

Sanford, FL 32771

WILLIAMS, DE'VONN JAHIEM ANDREVIO

Sanford, FL 32771

 

Court Documents

INTAKE SHEET

09/24/2020: INTAKE SHEET

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

09/28/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

CITATION(S): A127FVP

09/24/2020: CITATION(S): A127FVP

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

TRAFFIC COURTESY NOTICE 38051

09/24/2020: TRAFFIC COURTESY NOTICE 38051

TRAFFIC COURTESY NOTICE 38052

09/24/2020: TRAFFIC COURTESY NOTICE 38052

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 11/17/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: AC20094342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: AC20094342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 09/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT NOV 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[M] - DATE: 11/17/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: AA20653447 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: JACKIE BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: AA20653448 - AMT: $5000.00 - NAME: JACKIE BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: AC20094342 - AMT: $15000.00 - NAME: JACKIE BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 09/24/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTRAFFIC COURTESY NOTICE 38051

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $15000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $5000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): A127FVP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(1)(A)(2) - MARIJUANA-POSSESS- WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG OR DELIV SCH I DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(1)(A)(2) - MARIJUANA-POSSESS- WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG OR DELIV SCH I; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 15000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(1)(A)(2) - MARIJUANA-POSSESS- WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG OR DELIV SCH I; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 09/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.1935(1) - FLEEING OR ATTEMPTING TO ELUDE A POLICE OFFICER DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.1935(2) - FLEE AND ELUDE; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 5000.00; CITATION NUMBER: A127FVP; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.1935(1) - FLEEING OR ATTEMPTING TO ELUDE A POLICE OFFICER; STATUS: AMENDED; FILE DATE: 09/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 790.01(2) - CARRYING CONCEALED FIREARM DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 790.01(2) - CARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON UNLICENSED FIREARM; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 790.01(2) - CARRYING CONCEALED FIREARM; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 09/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less