This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/09/2020 at 23:37:10 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WILLIAMS, ALICIA ALETA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, ALICIA ALETA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********290A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, ALICIA ALETA

Sanford, FL 32771

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED - NOTICE TO APPEAR

02/04/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED - NOTICE TO APPEAR

NO INFORMATION FILED

02/06/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818301

02/07/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818301

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

01/19/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818301 - AMT: $500 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

01/23/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818301 - AMT: $500 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 14, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/24/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 14, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 02/14/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: U520818301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED - NOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 14, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818301 - AMT: $500 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[R] - DATE: 02/14/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/06/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less