This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 13:05:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WILLIAMS, ALICIA ALETA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WILLIAMS, ALICIA ALETA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********291A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WILLIAMS, ALICIA ALETA

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

07/09/2020: 1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

AGREEMENT PAY $185.00 MO 08/09/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

07/09/2020: AGREEMENT PAY $185.00 MO 08/09/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818315

07/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818315

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818314

07/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818314

RECORDED JUDGMENT

07/13/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY (DOCUMENTS)

04/27/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY (DOCUMENTS)

AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAY 01, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

03/24/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAY 01, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

03/17/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (7)

03/04/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (7)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (1)

03/06/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (1)

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

02/14/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

*** CORRECTED MINUTES *** FROM 2/14/2020 CORRECTED TO REFLECT THE CORRECT COURT DATE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AS 3/12/2020 AT 1:30PM. CANCEL PREVIOUSLY SET PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/10/2020. NUNC PRO TUNC 2/14/2020

02/19/2020: *** CORRECTED MINUTES *** FROM 2/14/2020 CORRECTED TO REFLECT THE CORRECT COURT DATE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AS 3/12/2020 AT 1:30PM. CANCEL PREVIOUSLY SET PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/10/2020. NUNC PRO TUNC 2/14/2020

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 12, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/20/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 12, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED - NOTICE TO APPEAR

02/04/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED - NOTICE TO APPEAR

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/05/2020

02/05/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/05/2020

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

01/19/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 14, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/24/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 14, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PAYFEE; Comments: AGREEMENT PAY $185.00 MO 08/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/10/2020; Total Assesment: $25.00; Fail Comply: 08/09/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818314

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520818315

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION BASIC SUBSTANCE ABUSE EDUCATION CLASS/ORAL RECONATION THERAPY 8 HOUR ANGER MANAGEMENT EDUCATION CLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 07/09/2020 / 0230 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $740.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $740.00; Total Amount Ordered: $740.00; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 ASSAULT; Comments: $60ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 07/09/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $10CLERK; $20CSTF; $201DVTF; $151RCPTF; 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $565.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $565.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - ATTYFEE; Comments: $50.00 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Comments: $50.00 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 856.011 - DISORDERLY INTOXICATION DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (07/09/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY TOUCH OR STRIKE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 856.011 - DISORDERLY INTOXICATION; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 856.011 - DISORDERLY INTOXICATION; DECISION DATE: 07/09/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 07/09/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/09/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: COLLINS, JERRI L; SENTENCE DESC: JAIL 6 DAYS; CONFINEMENT TYPE: COUNTY JAIL; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 6 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 6 DAYS(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.011 - ASSAULT DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (07/09/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.011 - SIMPLE ASSLT- INTENT THREAT TO DO VIOLENCE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.011 - ASSAULT; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.011 - ASSAULT; DECISION DATE: 07/09/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 07/09/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/09/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: COLLINS, JERRI L; SENTENCE DESC: $565.00 TOTAL/JAIL 6 DAYS; CONFINEMENT TYPE: COUNTY JAIL; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 6 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 6 DAYS(S); COURT COST: $ 565.00

    Read MoreRead Less