This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 19:35:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS WERNER, PATRICK J

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WERNER, PATRICK J. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********288A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

WERNER, PATRICK J

Orlando, FL 32835

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ELIGIBILITY TO PETITION FOR A EXPUNGE ORDER

07/23/2020: CERTIFICATE OF ELIGIBILITY TO PETITION FOR A EXPUNGE ORDER

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

01/19/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

NO INFORMATION FILED

01/22/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

BOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND#: 2101585 - AMT: $500

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND#: 2101585 - AMT: $500

NOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2101585

01/23/2020: NOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2101585

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ELIGIBILITY TO PETITION FOR A EXPUNGE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketBOND PAID TO DEPOSITOR - BOND#: 2101585 - AMT: $491.50 - DATE: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2101585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: 2101585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND#: 2101585 - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[R] - DATE: 02/14/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DV) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DV); OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DV); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/22/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less