This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:08:55 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS VELAZQUEZ, EBI LLIDANA

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against VELAZQUEZ, EBI LLIDANA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********056A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

VELAZQUEZ, EBI LLIDANA

De Leon Springs, FL 32130

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

COSTNER, LEROY E

Po Box 533069

Orlando, FL 32853

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

09/24/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketBOND PAID TO DEPOSITOR - BOND#: 2102063 - AMT: $491.50 - DATE: 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CLERK'S FINANCE OF CASH BOND DISPOSITION - BOND#: 2102063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: 2102063

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DECLINATION OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 23, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND#: 2102063 - AMT: $500 - NAME: DEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDO NOT RETURN TO 560 RED ROSE LANE, SANFORD, FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNO CONTACT WITH ROBINSON TREVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - STATUS: NOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 10/02/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less