This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:08:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS TURNER, JOSEPH DWIGHT

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TURNER, JOSEPH DWIGHT. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********068A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

TURNER, JOSEPH DWIGHT

Saint Cloud, FL 34769

BLUE, KEITH D

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

NOTICE TO APPEAR

09/24/2020: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 22, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

09/25/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 22, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 10/22/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 10/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 22, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[F] - DATE: 10/22/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - PETIT THEFT $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750 DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPERT; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: NOTICE TO APPEAR; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - PETIT THEFT $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 10/07/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less