This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 15:46:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS TOSONI, PETER FELIX

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TOSONI, PETER FELIX. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHOTT, FREDERIC and SCHOTT, FREDERIC M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********424A

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHOTT, FREDERIC

SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

TOSONI, PETER FELIX

Casselberry, FL 32707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KALEITA, JACK A

1220 Commerce Park Dr, Suite 103

Longwood, FL 32779

 

Court Documents

VICTIM IMPACT STATEMENT

06/02/2020: VICTIM IMPACT STATEMENT

NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING JUL 23, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

06/03/2020: NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING JUL 23, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE JUN 02, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

04/17/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE JUN 02, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 20, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

03/26/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 20, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (6)

03/11/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (6)

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC SCHOTT

02/25/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC SCHOTT

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 24, 2020 AT 09:30 AM PRINTED

02/26/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 24, 2020 AT 09:30 AM PRINTED

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

03/03/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY (DOCUMENTS)

03/04/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY (DOCUMENTS)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (6)

03/05/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (6)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (3)

03/06/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (3)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: KALEITA, JACK A

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: KALEITA, JACK A

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/12/2020

02/12/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/12/2020

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409631 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

02/03/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409631 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409629 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

02/03/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409629 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409630 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

02/03/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409630 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/30/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 08/21/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4D CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 07/23/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4D CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketCOURT GRANTED DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE WITH WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket--FREDERIC M. SCHOTT. MANDATORY COURT APPEARANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDOCKET REVIEW SET FOR FOR 08/21/2020 AT 0900AM COURTROOM 4D BEFORE JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket--HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY KALEITA, JACK A--VIA TEAMS WAS PRESENT FOR DOCKET REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket--DOCKET REVIEW HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROGER WALKER/ FRANCISCO A. CRUZ II--VIA TEAMS WAS PRESENT FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 01/30/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500 X3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 3 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(1) - CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 OR LESS DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(1) - CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 OR LESS; OFFENSE DATE: 01/22/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(1) - CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 OR LESS; STATUS: NEW; FILE DATE: 02/12/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(1) - CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 OR LESS DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(2) - DAMAGE PROP-CRIM MISCH- OVER 200 DOLLARS UNDER 1000 DOLLARS; OFFENSE DATE: 01/22/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(1) - CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 OR LESS; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/12/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 4 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 365.16(1)(D) - HARASSING TELEPHONE CALLS DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.048(2) - STALKING- FOLLOW HARASS CYBERSTALK ANOTHER; OFFENSE DATE: 01/21/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 365.16(1)(D) - HARASSING TELEPHONE CALLS; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/12/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(1) - CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 OR LESS DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(2) - DAMAGE PROP-CRIM MISCH- OVER 200 DOLLARS UNDER 1000 DOLLARS; OFFENSE DATE: 01/21/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 806.13(1)(B)(1) - CRIMINAL MISCHIEF $200 OR LESS; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/12/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less