This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 17:04:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS THOMAS, TIMOTHY NATHANAEL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against THOMAS, TIMOTHY NATHANAEL. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVA, MARLENE M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********119A

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVA, MARLENE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

THOMAS, TIMOTHY NATHANAEL

Apopka, FL 32712

 

Court Documents

TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020MM000347A )

01/23/2020: TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020MM000347A )

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409100 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/14/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409100 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409101 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/14/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409101 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: MAGIC CA

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

CITATION(S): A0Q7CPP

01/12/2020: CITATION(S): A0Q7CPP

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/11/2020

01/12/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/11/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/12/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L. MCINTOSH

01/12/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L. MCINTOSH

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

01/15/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020MM000347A )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409101 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409100 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[E] - DATE: 03/03/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L. MCINTOSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND NOT INDIGENT - DOES NOT QUALIFY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY FRANCISCO A. CRUZ II WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): A0Q7CPP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 901.36(1) - FRAUD-IMPERSON- FALSE ID GIVEN TO LEO DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 901.36(1) - FRAUD-IMPERSON- FALSE ID GIVEN TO LEO; OFFENSE DATE: 01/11/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 901.36(1) - FRAUD-IMPERSON- FALSE ID GIVEN TO LEO; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/23/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(5) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED OR REVOKED DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(5) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED OR REVOKED; OFFENSE DATE: 01/11/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; CITATION NUMBER: A0Q7CPP; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(5) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED OR REVOKED; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/23/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less