This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/06/2020 at 17:32:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SMITH, SHANNON ANTOINETTE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SMITH, SHANNON ANTOINETTE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********295A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

SMITH, SHANNON ANTOINETTE

Orlando, FL 32818

MCCOY, SHANNON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

BLANC, ANNIE

101 Sunnytown Rd, Suite 310

Casselberry, FL 32707

 

Court Documents

NOLLE PROSEQUI - DATE: 06/03/2020

06/03/2020: NOLLE PROSEQUI - DATE: 06/03/2020

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

05/28/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

MOTION TO REVOKE PRE TRIAL RELEASE

05/18/2020: MOTION TO REVOKE PRE TRIAL RELEASE

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (2)

04/24/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (2)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

04/28/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

04/13/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

03/05/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

03/06/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: BLANC, ANNIE

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: BLANC, ANNIE

NOTICE OF (DEMAND FOR) DISCOVERY

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF (DEMAND FOR) DISCOVERY

MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

02/24/2020: MOTION FOR DISCLOSURE OF IMPEACHING INFORMATION AND EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: 02/18/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 4B

02/18/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: 02/18/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 4B

MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

02/18/2020: MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

02/18/2020: ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 12, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/19/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 12, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/03/2020

02/03/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/03/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS

REQUEST & ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

01/21/2020: REQUEST & ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • HearingTYPE: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; DATE / TIME: 06/05/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI - DATE: 06/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO REVOKE PRE TRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE JUN 05, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketRESCHEDULED PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AOSC20-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketAMENDED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE[R] - DATE: 06/05/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 4B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESISTING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/17/2020; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESISTING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/03/2020; FINAL ACTION: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less