This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/31/2020 at 16:41:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SINGH, KAVIN

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SINGH, KAVIN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, DEBRA S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********462A

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, DEBRA S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SINGH, KAVIN

Orlando, FL 32808

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

03/30/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786626

03/31/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786626

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786625

03/31/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786625

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786624

03/31/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786624

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786625 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

02/21/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786625 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786626 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

02/21/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786626 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786624 - AMT: $3000 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

02/21/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786624 - AMT: $3000 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT APR 14, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/24/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT APR 14, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

INTAKE SHEET

02/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/19/2020

02/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/19/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786626

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: U620786626

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: U620786625

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: U620786624

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT APR 14, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[A] - DATE: 04/14/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786624 - AMT: $3000 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786625 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 02/19/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 876.43 - TRESPASSING - ENTRY ON PROPERTY UNLAWFULLY DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 876.43 - TRESPASSING - ENTRY ON PROPERTY UNLAWFULLY; OFFENSE DATE: 02/19/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 876.43 - TRESPASSING - ENTRY ON PROPERTY UNLAWFULLY; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 03/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 856.021 - LOITERING - OR PROWLING DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 856.021 - LOITERING - OR PROWLING; OFFENSE DATE: 02/19/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 856.021 - LOITERING - OR PROWLING; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 03/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.80(1) - TRANSP DANGEROUS MATERIAL UNLAWFUL CONVEYANCE OF FUEL DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.80(1) - TRANSP DANGEROUS MATERIAL UNLAWFUL CONVEYANCE OF FUEL; OFFENSE DATE: 02/19/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 3000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.80(1) - TRANSP DANGEROUS MATERIAL UNLAWFUL CONVEYANCE OF FUEL; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 03/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 02/19/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $263.00 X 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less