This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 13:05:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SIMS, JARLEEL JEROME

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SIMS, JARLEEL JEROME. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********205A

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SIMS, JARLEEL JEROME

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

07/09/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: AA19608861

07/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: AA19608861

RECORDED JUDGMENT

07/13/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

05/20/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE

04/27/2020: STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE

MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

04/27/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

04/03/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAY 01, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

03/24/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAY 01, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

03/04/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

03/11/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

03/09/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

02/10/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

02/10/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

02/13/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/31/2020

01/31/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/31/2020

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/13/2020

01/14/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/13/2020

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/16/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: AA19608861

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 07/09/2020 / 0230 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $363.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $363.00; Total Amount Ordered: $363.00; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 DISORDERLY CONDUCT; Comments: $60ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 07/09/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $10CLERK; $20CSTF; 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $213.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - ATTYFEE; Comments: $50.00 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Comments: $50.00 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialLien Date: 07/09/2020; Lien Amount: $65.00; Lien percent: 6.03; O.R. Book: 9647; O.R. Page: 478/479; County Recorded: SEMINOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[R] - DATE: 02/10/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: AA19608861 - AMT: $263 - NAME: JACKIE BAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $263

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 877.03 - DISORDERLY CONDUCT DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATION WITHHELD (07/09/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 877.03 - DISTURBING PEACE- BREACH OF THE PEACE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/13/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 877.03 - DISORDERLY CONDUCT; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 01/31/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 877.03 - DISORDERLY CONDUCT; DECISION DATE: 07/09/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 07/09/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/09/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: COLLINS, JERRI L; SENTENCE DESC: $213.00 TOTAL; COURT COST: $ 213.00

    Read MoreRead Less