This case was last updated from Seminole County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/17/2022 at 22:12:25 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SHERMAN, JEREMY DANIEL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SHERMAN, JEREMY DANIEL. This case was filed in Seminole County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SOUTO, MELISSA D. and MCINTOSH, DONNA L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********430A

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SOUTO, MELISSA D.

MCINTOSH, DONNA L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SHERMAN, JEREMY DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

POLLACK, ADAM L

933 Lee Road Suite 350

Orlando, FL 32810

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 06/12/2022

06/13/2022: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 06/12/2022

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT AUG 09, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

06/16/2022: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT AUG 09, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2022AA026350 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: A-1 KIM

06/14/2022: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2022AA026350 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: A-1 KIM

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2022AA026349 - AMT: $500.00 - NAME: A-1 KIM

06/14/2022: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2022AA026349 - AMT: $500.00 - NAME: A-1 KIM

INTAKE SHEET

06/13/2022: INTAKE SHEET

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 06/23/2022

06/23/2022: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 06/23/2022

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

06/21/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ANY AND ALL PRE TRIAL CONFERENCES

06/21/2022: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ANY AND ALL PRE TRIAL CONFERENCES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: POLLACK, ADAM L

06/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: POLLACK, ADAM L

CITATION(S): AGBQC5E

06/14/2022: CITATION(S): AGBQC5E

SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION

06/14/2022: SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING SEP 07, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

08/11/2022: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING SEP 07, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT - FROM: A TO: A : MCINTOSH, DONNA L

08/10/2022: ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT - FROM: A TO: A : MCINTOSH, DONNA L

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING SEP 07, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

08/10/2022: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING SEP 07, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MELISSA D. SOUTO

08/09/2022: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MELISSA D. SOUTO

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingType: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 09/07/2022 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: MCINTOSH, DONNA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING SEP 07, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDOCKET SOUNDING[A] - DATE: 09/07/2022 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 5C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REASSIGNMENT - FROM: A TO: A : MCINTOSH, DONNA L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING SEP 07, 2022 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • HearingType: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 08/09/2022 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: SOUTO, MELISSA D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MELISSA D. SOUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketALL CHARGES: DEFENDANT CONTINUED ON BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketALL CHARGES: DEFENDANT ENTERED A PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Docket--DIVISION A WITH JUDGE MCINTOSH.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[J] - DATE: 08/09/2022 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2022AA026350 - AMT: $2000.00 - NAME: A-1 KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2022AA026349 - AMT: $500.00 - NAME: A-1 KIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 06/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - INFRACTIONS - 316.074(1) - VIOLATION OF TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE; ARREST DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.074(1) - VIOLATION OF TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE; OFFENSE DATE: 06/12/2022; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: AGBQC5E; PROSECUTION DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.074(1) - VIOLATION OF TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE; STATUS: SAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - DRUG EQUIP-POSSESS AND OR USE; OFFENSE DATE: 06/12/2022; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 06/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF COCAINE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - COCAINE-POSSESS POSSESS COCAINE; OFFENSE DATE: 06/12/2022; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF COCAINE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 06/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAM POLLACK