This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:07:51 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SEXTON JR, NEGALE MAURICE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SEXTON JR, NEGALE MAURICE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********052B

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SEXTON JR, NEGALE MAURICE

Lake Mary, FL 32746

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

09/29/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

09/24/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

INTAKE SHEET

09/24/2020: INTAKE SHEET

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 09/24/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket--CHASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 11/17/2020 AT 0130PM IN COURTROOM 1A WITH JUDGE MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket--F-3: BOND SET IN AMOUNT: $15000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(0)MARIJUANA-POSSESS- WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG OR DELIV SCH I 893.13(1)(A)(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNO CONTACT WITH DEVONN JAHIEM ANDREVIO WILLIAMS OUTSIDE OF JAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $15000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(1)(A)(2) - MARIJUANA-POSSESS- WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG OR DELIV SCH I DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(1)(A)(2) - MARIJUANA-POSSESS- WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG OR DELIV SCH I; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 15000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(1)(A)(2) - MARIJUANA-POSSESS- WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG OR DELIV SCH I; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 09/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less