Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 18:26:20 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SCOTT, YVETTE

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SCOTT, YVETTE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WOODARD III, JOHN and WOODARD III, JOHN L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********491A

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WOODARD III, JOHN

WOODARD III, JOHN L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SCOTT, YVETTE

Sanford, FL 32773

 

Court Documents

LETTER RESPONSE:MOTION GRANTED ALLOW PAYOUT OF $10 PER HOUR GIVE 90 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER TO PAY

08/04/2020: LETTER RESPONSE:MOTION GRANTED ALLOW PAYOUT OF $10 PER HOUR GIVE 90 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER TO PAY

LETTER RESPONSE: 120 DAY EXTENSION GRANTED

07/20/2020: LETTER RESPONSE: 120 DAY EXTENSION GRANTED

COPY OF EMAIL FROM DEF TO JUDGE RE:WOULD LIKE TO BUY OUT COMMUNITY SERVICE

07/24/2020: COPY OF EMAIL FROM DEF TO JUDGE RE:WOULD LIKE TO BUY OUT COMMUNITY SERVICE

NOTICE OF DELINQUENT ACCOUNT

06/04/2020: NOTICE OF DELINQUENT ACCOUNT

DEMAND FOR PAYMENT -COMPLIANCE DEP- - DATE: 06/28/2020

06/23/2020: DEMAND FOR PAYMENT -COMPLIANCE DEP- - DATE: 06/28/2020

LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DEF RE:WOULD LIKE AN EXTENSION ON COSTS

06/26/2020: LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DEF RE:WOULD LIKE AN EXTENSION ON COSTS

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JOHN WOODARD III

03/02/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JOHN WOODARD III

JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS

03/02/2020: JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520833073

03/03/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U520833073

AGREEMENT PAY $72.00 MO 04/02/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

03/02/2020: AGREEMENT PAY $72.00 MO 04/02/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

RECORDED JUDGMENT

03/04/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/18/2020

02/18/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/18/2020

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/02/2020

02/03/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/02/2020

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520833073 - AMT: $263 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

02/04/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520833073 - AMT: $263 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 02, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/05/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 02, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2020
  • DocketCharge - Cit Num: CNT#1 - PETIT THEFT; Type: COMM - COMMUNITY SERVICE; Fail To Comply Date: 10/04/2020; Notice Failed to Comply Date: Completed: NO; Completion Date: Community Serv. Hours: 50.00; Comm. Serv. Buyout: YES; Comm. Serv. Rate: $10.00; Comm. Serv. Completed: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER RESPONSE:MOTION GRANTED ALLOW PAYOUT OF $10 PER HOUR GIVE 90 DAYS FROM DATE OF THIS ORDER TO PAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF EMAIL FROM DEF TO JUDGE RE:WOULD LIKE TO BUY OUT COMMUNITY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/23/2020; Receipt Number: 290222; Amount: $25.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/23/2020; Receipt Number: 290222; Amount: $50.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/23/2020; Receipt Number: 290222; Amount: $213.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT 2020-113-051660 DISTRIBUTED TO 3 UFNS, TOTAL $288.00 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER RESPONSE: 120 DAY EXTENSION GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO JUDGE FROM DEF RE:WOULD LIKE AN EXTENSION ON COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR PAYMENT -COMPLIANCE DEP- - DATE: 06/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT SWORN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 02, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[U] - DATE: 03/02/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520833073 - AMT: $263 - NAME: JUANS FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $263

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (03/02/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC- PETIT FIRST OFFENSE; OFFENSE DATE: 02/02/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/18/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; DECISION DATE: 03/02/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 03/02/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 03/02/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: WOODARD III, JOHN L; SENTENCE DESC: $213.00 TOTAL/6 MONTHS PROB; PROBATION LENGTH: 6 MONTH(S); COURT COST: $ 213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant