Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/11/2020 at 17:32:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SAMUELS, ANITA JANE

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SAMUELS, ANITA JANE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, DEBRA S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********187A

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, DEBRA S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAMUELS, ANITA JANE

Orlando, FL 32808

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CAMPBELL, ALLAN

Po Box 953724

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

02/04/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

02/06/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 3600831543 - AMT: $500 - NAME: ANYTIME BANK

01/27/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 3600831543 - AMT: $500 - NAME: ANYTIME BANK

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 18, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

01/28/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 18, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

WITNESS INTERVIEW

01/28/2020: WITNESS INTERVIEW

NO INFORMATION FILED

01/29/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: 3600831543

01/30/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: 3600831543

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

01/24/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: CAMPBELL, ALLAN

01/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: CAMPBELL, ALLAN

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/19/2020

01/20/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/19/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/20/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/20/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY - NAME: REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

01/20/2020: ORDER APPOINTING CONFLICT ATTORNEY - NAME: REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

01/22/2020: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD

CERT OF CONFLICT BY OFF OF REG CRIM AND CIVIL CONFLICT (5TH)

01/22/2020: CERT OF CONFLICT BY OFF OF REG CRIM AND CIVIL CONFLICT (5TH)

ORDER APPOINTING REGISTRY ATTORNEY - NAME: CAMPBELL, ALLAN

01/22/2020: ORDER APPOINTING REGISTRY ATTORNEY - NAME: CAMPBELL, ALLAN

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE OF NO INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: 3600831543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: 3600831543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS INTERVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 18, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 3600831543 - AMT: $500 - NAME: ANYTIME BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $0.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $0.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0; Total Amount Waived: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - AFPDFEE; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED 01/20/2020; DROPPED; Fine Date: 01/24/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 01/27/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00 WAIVED/DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketTHE COURT FINDS PROBABLE CAUSE AS TO TRESPASSING AND SET BOND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED OFFICE OF CRIMINAL CONFLICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(6) - VEH THEFT- GRAND THEFT OF MOTOR VEH DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(6) - VEH THEFT- GRAND THEFT OF MOTOR VEH; OFFENSE DATE: 01/19/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(6) - VEH THEFT- GRAND THEFT OF MOTOR VEH; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPBELL, ALLAN