This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/11/2020 at 13:08:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS SALAZAR, FRANCISCO DAVID

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against SALAZAR, FRANCISCO DAVID. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NELSON, DEBRA S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********196A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NELSON, DEBRA S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SALAZAR, FRANCISCO DAVID

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

02/07/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409144

02/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409144

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409144 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409144 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 18, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

01/23/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 18, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/19/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/19/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 02/18/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: NELSON, DEBRA S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: X60409144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $0.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $0.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0; Total Amount Waived: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - AFPDFEE; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED 01/19/2020; DROPPED; Fine Date: 01/23/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 01/26/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00 WAIVED/DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 18, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR NINETY(90) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION OR INDICTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSWORN TO AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 784.045(1)(B) - AGGRAV BATTERY-MAJOR INJURY- OFFENDER KNEW OR SHOULD HAVE KN DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 784.045(1)(B) - AGGRAV BATTERY-MAJOR INJURY- OFFENDER KNEW OR SHOULD HAVE KN; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 784.045(1)(B) - AGGRAV BATTERY-MAJOR INJURY- OFFENDER KNEW OR SHOULD HAVE KN; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/07/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less