This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:05:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS RUDOLPH, AYANNA KALI

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RUDOLPH, AYANNA KALI. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********059A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RUDOLPH, AYANNA KALI

Sanford, FL 32771

 

Court Documents

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 19, 2020 AT 10:00 AM PRINTED

09/28/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 19, 2020 AT 10:00 AM PRINTED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 10/19/2020 / 1000 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 10/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $50.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $50.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - AFPDFEE; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED 09/24/2020; Fine Date: 09/28/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 10/01/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT OCT 19, 2020 AT 10:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[F] - DATE: 10/19/2020 - TIME: 1000AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: 2020AA039797 - AMT: $500.00 - NAME: A 1 KIM SANFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 09/24/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESISTING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESISTING AN OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 10/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less