This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/20/2020 at 17:13:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS ROMERO ALMANZA, GUSTAVO ALBERTO

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ROMERO ALMANZA, GUSTAVO ALBERTO. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********281A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ROMERO ALMANZA, GUSTAVO ALBERTO

Deltona, FL 32725

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GIGLIOTTI, JAMES J

P O Box 533504

Orlando, FL 32853

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

07/08/2020: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

07/09/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

05/20/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING JUN 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

04/16/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING JUN 17, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING APR 29, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

03/23/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING APR 29, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/09/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAR 25, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

03/11/2020: NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING MAR 25, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

03/05/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (2)

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE

02/24/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (4)

02/14/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (4)

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/03/2020

02/03/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/03/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: GIGLIOTTI, JAMES J

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: GIGLIOTTI, JAMES J

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

02/10/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/11/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

02/11/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/17/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/17/2020

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE224448 - AMT: $500 - NAME: AAA UNLIMITED

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE224448 - AMT: $500 - NAME: AAA UNLIMITED

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/23/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 08/12/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 07/09/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCOURT GRANTED DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket--L COLLINS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDOCKET REVIEW SET FOR FOR 08/12/2020 AT 0900AM COURTROOM 4B BEFORE JUDGE JERRI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDEFENSE ATTORNEY GIGLIOTTI, JAMES J WAS NOT PRESENT FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY GRANT GRIMES/ISELA GUZMAN WAS PRESENT FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: GIGLIOTTI, JAMES J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 10, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[R] - DATE: 02/10/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE224448 - AMT: $500 - NAME: AAA UNLIMITED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.015(6) - RESISTING RECOVERY OF MERCHANDISE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.015(6) - RESISTING RECOVERY OF MERCHANDISE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/17/2020; STATUS: NA; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.015(6) - RESISTING RECOVERY OF MERCHANDISE; STATUS: NEW; FILE DATE: 02/03/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(B) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750 DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PT 1ST DEG PROP 100 TO LESS 75; OFFENSE DATE: 01/17/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(B) - PETIT THEFT - $100 OR MORE, BUT LESS THAN $750; STATUS: AMENDED; FILE DATE: 02/03/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less