Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/17/2020 at 17:43:45 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS RODRIGUEZ, LISSETTE

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, LISSETTE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVA, MARLENE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********270A

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVA, MARLENE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RODRIGUEZ, LISSETTE

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

07/21/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

07/21/2020: 1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

05/26/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT AUG 04, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

05/27/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT AUG 04, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

*** CORRECTED MINUTES *** TO CANCEL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 6/23/2020 AT 130PM IN COURTROOM 1A BEFORE JUDGE ALVA. NUNC PRO TUNC 5/26/2020

05/27/2020: *** CORRECTED MINUTES *** TO CANCEL ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 6/23/2020 AT 130PM IN COURTROOM 1A BEFORE JUDGE ALVA. NUNC PRO TUNC 5/26/2020

AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT JUN 23, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

04/14/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT JUN 23, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT APR 28, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

03/27/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT APR 28, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/03/2020

02/04/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/03/2020

CAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED

02/04/2020: CAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE5135338 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: QUICK ORLANDO

02/05/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE5135338 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: QUICK ORLANDO

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 31, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/06/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 31, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/28/2020

01/28/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/28/2020

COMPLAINT

01/28/2020: COMPLAINT

DAVID REPORT

01/29/2020: DAVID REPORT

CAPIAS SIGNED AND ISSUED - DATE: 01/30/2020

01/30/2020: CAPIAS SIGNED AND ISSUED - DATE: 01/30/2020

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 09/01/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: ALVA, MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket--F-3: DEFENDANT CONTINUED ON BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(1)OBTAINING BENEFITS UNDER PUBLIC ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS BY FRAUD 414.39(1)(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket--MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketCANCEL ARRAIGNMENT FOR 08/04/2020 AT 0130PM IN COURTROOM 1A BEFORE JUDGE ALVA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketTHIS IS A COURT CONTINUANCE.CORRECTED TO DELETE NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT CONTINUED TO 09/01/2020 AT 0130PM IN COURTROOM 1A, AT CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY TYRONE POLK WAS PRESENT FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE5135338 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: QUICK ORLANDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCAPIAS SIGNED AND ISSUED - DATE: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDAVID REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCAPIAS ISSUED DIRECT - DATE: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 414.39(1)(A) - OBTAINING BENEFITS UNDER PUBLIC ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS BY FRAUD DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 414.39(1)(A) - OBTAINING BENEFITS UNDER PUBLIC ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS BY FRAUD; OFFENSE DATE: 12/05/2017; STATUS: SWORN COMPLAINT; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 414.39(1)(A) - OBTAINING BENEFITS UNDER PUBLIC ASSISTANCE PROGRAMS BY FRAUD; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 01/28/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant