This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:06:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS RICHARDS, RUSSELL JAY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against RICHARDS, RUSSELL JAY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVA, MARLENE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********054A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVA, MARLENE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

RICHARDS, RUSSELL JAY

Orlando, FL 32817

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

09/24/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

09/25/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

INTAKE SHEET

09/24/2020: INTAKE SHEET

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 10/27/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: ALVA, MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMEMO-REQUEST TO STATE ATTY FOR UNWRITTEN CITATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FILED - DATE: 09/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR NINETY (90) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 09/24/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $3000.00 X 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 3 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - DRUG EQUIP-POSSESS- AND OR USE; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - USE OR POSSESSION OF DRUG PARAPHERNALIA; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 09/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 322.34(2)(B) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANC, SUSP, REV W/ONE PRIOR DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(2)(C) - DRIVE WHILE LIC SUSP 3RD OR SUBSQ OFF; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 3000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 322.34(2)(B) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE CANC, SUSP, REV W/ONE PRIOR; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 09/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF COCAINE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - DRUGS-POSSESS COCAINE; OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 3000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF COCAINE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 09/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less