This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/05/2020 at 17:11:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS REDICK, DAVID LAWRENCE

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against REDICK, DAVID LAWRENCE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCINTOSH, DONNA L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********264A

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCINTOSH, DONNA L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

REDICK, DAVID LAWRENCE

Sanford, FL 32771

 

Court Documents

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409614 - AMT: $5000 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/31/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409614 - AMT: $5000 - NAME: MAGIC CA

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 10, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/03/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 10, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE JOHN WOODARD III

01/29/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE JOHN WOODARD III

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/28/2020

01/29/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/28/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: X60409614

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: X60409613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 10, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409614 - AMT: $5000 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409613 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 01/29/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: WOODARD III, JOHN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 01/29/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $5000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - STATUS: NOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 827.03(2)(C) - CRUELTY TOWARD CHILD ABUSE CHILD WITHOUT GREAT BODILY HARM DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 827.03(2)(C) - CRUELTY TOWARD CHILD ABUSE CHILD WITHOUT GREAT BODILY HARM; OFFENSE DATE: 01/28/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 5000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 827.03(2)(C) - CRUELTY TOWARD CHILD ABUSE CHILD WITHOUT GREAT BODILY HARM; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DV) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DV); OFFENSE DATE: 01/28/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DV); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less