Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 13:57:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS PARRIS, KATRINA LYNN

Case Summary

On 02/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against PARRIS, KATRINA LYNN. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J and CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********364A

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PARRIS, KATRINA LYNN

Deltona, FL 32738

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HALE, MONICA

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

SCHOENBERG, MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

07/22/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

MOTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

07/23/2020: MOTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT FOR COMPETENCY EVALUATION

07/28/2020: ORDER APPOINTING EXPERT FOR COMPETENCY EVALUATION

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

06/11/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

06/10/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (3)

05/21/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (3)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (1)

05/21/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (1)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

05/26/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

05/08/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

LETTER FROM SEMINOLE COUNTY PROBATION DIVISION RE: VIOLATION OF CONDITIONAL RELEASE REPORT

04/28/2020: LETTER FROM SEMINOLE COUNTY PROBATION DIVISION RE: VIOLATION OF CONDITIONAL RELEASE REPORT

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U1120798893

04/30/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U1120798893

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

03/18/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

03/24/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 13, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

03/25/2020: NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 13, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/14/2020

02/14/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/14/2020

INTAKE SHEET

02/08/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE JOHN GALLUZZO

02/08/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE JOHN GALLUZZO

NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS

02/10/2020: NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 09/16/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5D CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING EXPERT FOR COMPETENCY EVALUATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DETERMINE COMPETENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 07/22/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5D CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket--RETURNED TO CUSTODY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket(1)BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE WITH A BATTERY(FBL) 810.02(2)(A) F-1: DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketCOURT GRANTED DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketPOSSIBLE COMPETENCY EVALUATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE JOHN GALLUZZO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY GRANT GRIMES WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE; OFFENSE DATE: 02/07/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/14/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(2)(A) - BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE WITH A BATTERY(FBL) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(3)(D) - BURG- OCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED NOT PARTS; OFFENSE DATE: 02/07/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 8000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE FELONY - 810.02(2)(A) - BURGLARY OF A CONVEYANCE WITH A BATTERY(FBL); STATUS: AMENDED; FILE DATE: 02/14/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALE, MONICA