This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 17:04:09 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS OWUSU GAYMFI, DYLAN BRANDON

Case Summary

On 01/11/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against OWUSU GAYMFI, DYLAN BRANDON. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVA, MARLENE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********115A

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVA, MARLENE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

OWUSU GAYMFI, DYLAN BRANDON

Geneva, FL 32732

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L. MCINTOSH

01/11/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L. MCINTOSH

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

01/15/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/10/2020

01/11/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/10/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 03/03/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: ALVA, MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR NINETY (90) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[E] - DATE: 03/03/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $35000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE DONNA L. MCINTOSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER CROSS APPOINTED FROM 20CF79A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketCOURT FOUND INDIGENT AND APPOINTED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY FRANCISCO A. CRUZ II WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE FELONY - 794.011(4)(A) - SEX ASSLT SEX BAT 12 YR LES 18 YR BY PRSN 18 YR OR OLD; ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE FELONY - 794.011(4)(A) - SEX ASSLT SEX BAT 12 YR LES 18 YR BY PRSN 18 YR OR OLD; OFFENSE DATE: 01/10/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 35000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE FELONY - 794.011(4)(A) - SEX ASSLT SEX BAT 12 YR LES 18 YR BY PRSN 18 YR OR OLD; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less