This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/18/2020 at 14:20:15 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS MEAGHER, DEBONNY NICOLE

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MEAGHER, DEBONNY NICOLE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVA, MARLENE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********189A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVA, MARLENE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MEAGHER, DEBONNY NICOLE

Oviedo, FL 32765

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERNANDEZ, DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

CAUDILL, TIMOTHY D

101 Bush Blvd

Sanford, FL 32773

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT DOCKET SOUNDING AND

07/13/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT DOCKET SOUNDING AND

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

07/15/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

06/09/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

06/17/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

06/17/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING JUN 17, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

05/05/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING JUN 17, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

03/25/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE

AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 20, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

03/26/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR DOCKET SOUNDING MAY 20, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAY 26, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

03/27/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAY 26, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

03/03/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/17/2020

02/17/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/17/2020

BOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND#: 2101583 - AMT: $2000

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND#: 2101583 - AMT: $2000

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

01/23/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 03, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/19/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

CITATION(S): A3I405P

01/19/2020: CITATION(S): A3I405P

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • HearingTYPE: TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; DATE / TIME: 08/06/2020 / 0830 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: ALVA, MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 07/15/2020 / 0830 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: ALVA, MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketALL CHARGES: DEFENDANT CONTINUED ON BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket--PLEA ON JULY 21, 2020 AT 1:30 PM IN COURTROOM 5B BEFORE JUDGE ALVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE COURT DATE IS FOR CONTROL.CASE REMAINS SET FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket--MARLENE M ALVA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SCHEDULING SET FOR 08/06/2020 AT 0830AM COURTROOM 5B BEFORE JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE PREVIOUSLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketPD CAUDILL, TIMOTHY D WAS PRESENT FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[E] - DATE: 03/03/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: CA - BOND#: 2101583 - AMT: $2000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): A3I405P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - INFRACTIONS - 316.215(1) - NO TAIL LIGHTS; ARREST DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.215(1) - NO TAIL LIGHTS; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: A3I405P; PROSECUTION DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.215(1) - NO TAIL LIGHTS; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF HYDROMORPHONE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSS CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE W/O PRESCRIPTION; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF HYDROMORPHONE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/17/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less