This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/29/2020 at 08:15:50 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS LORA, RAPHAEL

Case Summary

On 02/23/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LORA, RAPHAEL. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********777A

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LORA, RAPHAEL

Sanford, FL 32773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

YADAV, RYAN N

520 W Lake Mary Blvd Ste 103

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

RECEIPT 2020-025-009044 001 DISCHARGING A FIREARM IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY 1 STATUS U, $50.00 PAID

08/06/2020: RECEIPT 2020-025-009044 001 DISCHARGING A FIREARM IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY 1 STATUS U, $50.00 PAID

NOTICE OF FILING COMPLETION CERTIFICATE OF BASIC HANDGUN TRAINING AND SAFETY CLASS

07/13/2020: NOTICE OF FILING COMPLETION CERTIFICATE OF BASIC HANDGUN TRAINING AND SAFETY CLASS

RECORDED JUDGMENT

07/13/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

07/09/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

AGREEMENT PAY $50.00 MO 08/09/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

07/09/2020: AGREEMENT PAY $50.00 MO 08/09/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786651

07/10/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786651

MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

06/05/2020: MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE JUN 05, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

04/16/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE JUN 05, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

04/01/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

03/24/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 17, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

03/25/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 17, 2020 AT 02:30 PM PRINTED

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 14, 2020 AT 11:00 AM PRINTED

03/17/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 14, 2020 AT 11:00 AM PRINTED

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & DEMAND FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

03/03/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY & DEMAND FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/DOCKET SOUNDING

03/03/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/DOCKET SOUNDING

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/22/2020

02/23/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/22/2020

INTAKE SHEET

02/23/2020: INTAKE SHEET

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786651 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

02/25/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786651 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 16, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/26/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 16, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 08/06/2020; Receipt Number: 296434; Amount: $50.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT 2020-025-009044 001 DISCHARGING A FIREARM IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY 1 STATUS U, $50.00 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COMPLETION CERTIFICATE OF BASIC HANDGUN TRAINING AND SAFETY CLASS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PAYFEE; Comments: AGREEMENT PAY $50.00 MO 08/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/10/2020; Total Assesment: $25.00; Fail Comply: 08/09/2020; Interest: $0.00; Last Paid: 07/09/2020; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $3.64; Balance: $21.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786651

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 07/09/2020 / 1000 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: COLLINS, JERRI L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $288.00; Total Amount Paid: $138.00; Total Balance Due: $150.00; Total Amount Ordered: $288.00; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 DISCHARGING A FIREARM IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY; Comments: $60ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 07/09/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $10CLERK; $20CSTF; 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $213.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Last Paid: 08/06/2020; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $134.36; Balance: $78.64

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Comments: $50.00 07/09/2020; Fine Date: 07/09/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 11/06/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE/DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY & DEMAND FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: YADAV, RYAN N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 16, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[R] - DATE: 03/16/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U620786651 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 790.15(1) - DISCHARGING A FIREARM IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATION WITHHELD (07/09/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 790.15(1) - FIRING WEAPON IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY CITY LIMI; OFFENSE DATE: 02/22/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 790.15(1) - DISCHARGING A FIREARM IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 03/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 790.15(1) - DISCHARGING A FIREARM IN PUBLIC OR ON RESIDENTIAL PROPERTY; DECISION DATE: 07/09/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 07/09/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/09/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: COLLINS, JERRI L; SENTENCE DESC: $213.00 TOTAL; COURT COST: $ 213.00

    Read MoreRead Less