Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 17:04:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS LEVASSEUR, EUGENE WILLARD

Case Summary

On 01/12/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against LEVASSEUR, EUGENE WILLARD. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRAUSE, DEBRA L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********190A

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

LEVASSEUR, EUGENE WILLARD

Sanford, FL 32773

 

Court Documents

TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020CT000303A )

01/23/2020: TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020CT000303A )

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409098

01/24/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409098

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409097

01/24/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409097

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/12/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

MEMORANDUM: TO UPDATE DRIVERS LICENSE

01/15/2020: MEMORANDUM: TO UPDATE DRIVERS LICENSE

CITATION(S): A3EBX2P

01/12/2020: CITATION(S): A3EBX2P

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/11/2020

01/12/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/11/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/12/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY FRANCISCO CRUZ II AND JUDGE MCINTOSH PRESENT

01/12/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY FRANCISCO CRUZ II AND JUDGE MCINTOSH PRESENT

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 05, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/14/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 05, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409096 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/14/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409096 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409097 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/14/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409097 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409098 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/14/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409098 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC CA

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 05, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/15/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 05, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409098

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020CT000303A )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: X60409098

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: X60409097

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM: TO UPDATE DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 05, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409098 - AMT: $263 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409097 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409096 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY FRANCISCO CRUZ II AND JUDGE MCINTOSH PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): A3EBX2P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - N/A, LEVEL IS INFRACTION, COUNTY, MUNICIPAL ORDINANCE COUNTY - 88888888888 - COUNTY ORD VIOL 1542A POSS OPEN CONTAINER IN VEHICLE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: N/A, LEVEL IS INFRACTION, COUNTY, MUNICIPAL ORDINANCE COUNTY - 88888888888 - COUNTY ORD VIOL 1542A POSS OPEN CONTAINER IN VEHICLE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/11/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: N/A, LEVEL IS INFRACTION, COUNTY, MUNICIPAL ORDINANCE COUNTY - 88888888888 - COUNTY ORD VIOL 1542A POSS OPEN CONTAINER IN VEHICLE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/23/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - DRUG EQUIP POSSESS AND OR USE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - DRUG EQUIP POSSESS AND OR USE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/11/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 893.147(1) - DRUG EQUIP POSSESS AND OR USE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/23/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 322.03(1) - NO VALID DRIVERS LICENSE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 322.03(1) - NO VALID DRIVERS LICENSE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/11/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; CITATION NUMBER: A3EBX2P; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 322.03(1) - NO VALID DRIVERS LICENSE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/23/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant