This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/09/2020 at 14:56:01 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KUSE, VIWE

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KUSE, VIWE. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J, KRAUSE, DEBRA L., SCHOTT, FREDERIC and SCHOTT, FREDERIC M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********537A

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

SCHOTT, FREDERIC

SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KUSE, VIWE

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

GROZINGER, PATRICK J

1217 E Robinson St Ste B

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

NOTICE TO SUSPEND D/L TO DHSMV -- COMPLIANCE DEP --

07/27/2020: NOTICE TO SUSPEND D/L TO DHSMV -- COMPLIANCE DEP --

NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING JUL 23, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

06/03/2020: NOTICE FOR DOCKET REVIEW HEARING JUL 23, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

04/24/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

04/03/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED NOTICE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND : U620790050 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

03/30/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND : U620790050 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC FIRE

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 20, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

03/31/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 20, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 17, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

03/19/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 17, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

*** CORRECTED MINUTES ***FROM 2/19/20 TO REFLECT THE TIME SET FOR THE NEXT COURT DATE. NUNC PRO TUNC 2/19/20

03/04/2020: *** CORRECTED MINUTES ***FROM 2/19/20 TO REFLECT THE TIME SET FOR THE NEXT COURT DATE. NUNC PRO TUNC 2/19/20

AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 24, 2020 AT 09:30 AM PRINTED

03/05/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE MAR 24, 2020 AT 09:30 AM PRINTED

DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

03/11/2020: DEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AMENDED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: 02/19/2020 - TIME: 1000AM - CTRM: UNK

02/18/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING - DATE: 02/19/2020 - TIME: 1000AM - CTRM: UNK

MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

02/19/2020: MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE DEBRA L. KRAUSE

NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY PATRICK J. GROZINGER

02/12/2020: NOTICE APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY PATRICK J. GROZINGER

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

02/12/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

INTAKE SHEET

01/22/2020: INTAKE SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/22/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/06/2020

02/06/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/06/2020

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATIONS TO THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - D6CO; Fine Date: 07/27/2020; Total Assesment: $32.00; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $32.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO SUSPEND D/L TO DHSMV -- COMPLIANCE DEP --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET REVIEW HEARING; DATE / TIME: 07/23/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4D CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $442.89; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $442.89; Total Amount Ordered: $442.89; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 PETIT THEFT; Comments: $60ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 07/23/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $10CLERK; $20CSTF; 07/23/2020; Fine Date: 07/23/2020; Total Assesment: $213.00; Fail Comply: 08/22/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Comments: $50.00 07/23/2020; Fine Date: 07/23/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 08/22/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - INVESTIG1; Comments: $97.89 ;ALTAMONTE SPRINGS POLICE DEPARTMENT; Fine Date: 07/23/2020; Total Assesment: $97.89; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $97.89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • FinancialLien Date: 07/23/2020; Lien Amount: $65.00; Lien percent: 6.03; O.R. Book: 9659; O.R. Page: 833/834; County Recorded: SEMINOLE

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT INDIGENT, APPOINT PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPD LARRY KOWAL WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY JOHN NAMEY WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 01/22/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $2000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (07/23/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(3)(C) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE THIRD S; OFFENSE DATE: 01/21/2020; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: NO BOND; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/06/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; DECISION DATE: 07/23/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 07/23/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/23/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M; SENTENCE DESC: $213.00 TOTAL/JAIL 20 DAYS; CONFINEMENT TYPE: COUNTY JAIL; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 20 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 20 DAYS(S); COURT COST: $ 213.00

    Read MoreRead Less