This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 19:30:22 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KUPIETZ, MARIA TERESA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KUPIETZ, MARIA TERESA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********292A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KUPIETZ, MARIA TERESA

Orlando, FL 32817

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

01/29/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

01/19/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/19/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

REQUEST & ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

01/21/2020: REQUEST & ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $0.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $0.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0; Total Amount Waived: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - AFPDFEE; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED 01/19/2020; DROPPED; Fine Date: 01/24/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 01/26/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00 WAIVED/DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST & ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[R] - DATE: 02/14/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $0.00 - STATUS: PTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 01/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less