This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/11/2023 at 08:02:14 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KETHAVATH, HARISHANKER

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KETHAVATH, HARISHANKER. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********531A

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KETHAVATH, HARISHANKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

BIGNEY, DAVID R

215 E Livingston St

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

DIVERSION AGREEMENT - DATE: 02/27/2023

02/27/2023: DIVERSION AGREEMENT - DATE: 02/27/2023

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

02/13/2023: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

RECEIPT 2023-258-000974 PROSECUTOR FEE PROSFEE, $50.00 PAID

02/06/2023: RECEIPT 2023-258-000974 PROSECUTOR FEE PROSFEE, $50.00 PAID

SEMINOLE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE COMMUNITY JUSTICE AND REHABILITATION DIVISION

02/06/2023: SEMINOLE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE COMMUNITY JUSTICE AND REHABILITATION DIVISION

MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

02/01/2023: MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION MAR 24, 2023 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/02/2023: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION MAR 24, 2023 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/04/2023

01/04/2023: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/04/2023

MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

01/06/2023: MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

01/06/2023: 1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FEB 01, 2023 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/09/2023: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FEB 01, 2023 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

01/09/2023: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

INVESTIGATIVE REPORT

12/20/2022: INVESTIGATIVE REPORT

NOTICE TO APPEAR

12/20/2022: NOTICE TO APPEAR

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: BIGNEY, DAVID R

12/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: BIGNEY, DAVID R

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

12/21/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

WRITTEN NOTICE FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

12/21/2022: WRITTEN NOTICE FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

12/21/2022: DEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

12/21/2022: DEFENSE DEMAND FOR EXCULPATORY INFORMATION

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • HearingType: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION; DATE / TIME: 03/24/2023 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4300; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketWAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIVERSION AGREEMENT - DATE: 02/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $50.00; Total Amount Paid: $50.00; Total Balance Due: $0.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Fine Date: 02/06/2023; Total Assesment: $50.00; Interest: $0.00; Last Paid: 02/06/2023; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialPayment Date: 02/06/2023; Receipt Number: 706289; Amount: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketINTAKE APPOINTMENT SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSEMINOLE COUNTY SHERIFFS OFFICE COMMUNITY JUSTICE AND REHABILITATION DIVISION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT 2023-258-000974 PROSECUTOR FEE PROSFEE, $50.00 PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCLOSURE OF CRIMINAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRITTEN NOTICE FOR DEFENSE DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: BIGNEY, DAVID R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT JAN 06, 2023 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • ChargeCHARGE 2 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.11(1)(A) - SELLING,GIVING,OR SERVING ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES TO PERSON UNDER AGE 21 DISPOSITION - PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION (02/27/2023); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.11(1)(A) - SALE OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE TO PERSON UNDER 21 YEARS OF AGE; OFFENSE DATE: 12/20/2022; STATUS: NOTICE TO APPEAR; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.11(1)(A) - SELLING,GIVING,OR SERVING ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES TO PERSON UNDER AGE 21; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 01/04/2023; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.11(1)(A) - SELLING,GIVING,OR SERVING ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES TO PERSON UNDER AGE 21; DECISION DATE: 02/27/2023; ACTION: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION; TRIAL TYPE: NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 569.101(1) - PROVIDING TOBACCO PRODUCTS TO A PERSON UNDER TWENTY-ONE DISPOSITION - PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION (02/27/2023); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 569.101(1) - SALE OF TOBACCO PROD/DEVICES TO PERSON UNDER 21 YEARS OF AGE; OFFENSE DATE: 12/20/2022; STATUS: NOTICE TO APPEAR; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 569.101(1) - PROVIDING TOBACCO PRODUCTS TO A PERSON UNDER TWENTY-ONE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 01/04/2023; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 569.101(1) - PROVIDING TOBACCO PRODUCTS TO A PERSON UNDER TWENTY-ONE; DECISION DATE: 02/27/2023; ACTION: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION; TRIAL TYPE: NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[F] - DATE: 01/06/2023 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINVESTIGATIVE REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less