This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 06/24/2020 at 17:43:27 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS KENDALL, AMELIA ALEX

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against KENDALL, AMELIA ALEX. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********190A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

KENDALL, AMELIA ALEX

Maitland, FL 32751

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

HYMAN, STUART I

1520 E Amelia St

Orlando, FL 32803

 

Court Documents

TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020MM000753A)

02/21/2020: TRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020MM000753A)

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818378 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MIKE SNAP FIRE

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818378 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MIKE SNAP FIRE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818370 - AMT: $1000 - NAME: MIKE SNAP FIRE

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818370 - AMT: $1000 - NAME: MIKE SNAP FIRE

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

01/23/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: HYMAN, STUART I

01/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: HYMAN, STUART I

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

01/24/2020: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

01/24/2020: MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

CITATION FILED ACIOESE

01/19/2020: CITATION FILED ACIOESE

SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION ACIOERE

01/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION ACIOERE

CITATION FILED ACIOETE

01/19/2020: CITATION FILED ACIOETE

SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION ACIOESE

01/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION ACIOESE

CITATION FILED ACIOERE

01/19/2020: CITATION FILED ACIOERE

SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION ACIOETE

01/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION ACIOETE

CITATION(S): A9P43RE

01/19/2020: CITATION(S): A9P43RE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/19/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSFERRED TO COUNTY COURT (2020MM000753A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR TEN (10) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: HYMAN, STUART I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: U520818370 - AMT: $1000 - NAME: MIKE SNAP FIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): A9P43RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION FILED ACIOERE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION FILED ACIOETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION FILED ACIOESE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - INFRACTIONS - 316.646(1) - NO PROOF OF INSURANCE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.646(1) - NO PROOF OF INSURANCE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: ACIOETE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.646(1) - NO PROOF OF INSURANCE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/21/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - INFRACTIONS - 320.0605 - FAIL TO DISPLAY REGISTRATION/TEMPORARY INTERNET RECEIPT; POS DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 320.0605 - FAIL TO DISPLAY REGISTRATION/TEMPORARY INTERNET RECEIPT; POS; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: ACIOERE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 320.0605 - FAIL TO DISPLAY REGISTRATION/TEMPORARY INTERNET RECEIPT; POS; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/21/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - INFRACTIONS - 316.089(1) - FAIL TO DRIVE IN SINGLE LANE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.089(1) - FAIL TO DRIVE IN SINGLE LANE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: ACIOESE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.089(1) - FAIL TO DRIVE IN SINGLE LANE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/21/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.193(2)(B)(3) - DUI - 4TH SUBSQ. OFFENSE (REFUSAL) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.193(2)(B)(3) - DUI - 4TH SUBSQ. OFFENSE (REFUSAL); OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 1000.00; CITATION NUMBER: A9P43RE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 316.193(2)(B)(3) - DUI - 4TH SUBSQ. OFFENSE (REFUSAL); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/21/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/21/2020; FINAL ACTION: TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER COURT

    Read MoreRead Less