This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/18/2020 at 17:45:49 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS JOHNSON, OLON LA LA KEI

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, OLON LA LA KEI. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVA, MARLENE M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********194A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVA, MARLENE M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOHNSON, OLON LA LA KEI

Orlando, FL 32714

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

PARSONS, ALPHEUS C

101 Bush Blvd

Sanford, FL 32773

 

Court Documents

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

07/15/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

06/17/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

MINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

05/28/2020: MINUTES FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

05/18/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

05/04/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

04/27/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (8)

04/20/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (8)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (4)

04/22/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (4)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

04/23/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

AMENDED NOTICE FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MAY 28, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

04/15/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MAY 28, 2020 AT 08:30 AM PRINTED

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

04/07/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

03/31/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

03/03/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

03/03/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/19/2020

02/19/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/19/2020

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • HearingTYPE: TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; DATE / TIME: 08/06/2020 / 0830 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: ALVA, MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 07/15/2020 / 0830 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5B CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: ALVA, MARLENE M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE M ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket--DEFENDANT RETURNED TO CUSTODY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(1)GRAND THEFT ($750 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000) 812.014(2)(C)(1) F-3:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket**THIS IS A POSSIBLE PLEA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket--MARLENE M ALVA. MANDATORY COURT APPEARANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SCHEDULING SET FOR 08/06/2020 AT 0830AM COURTROOM 5B BEFORE JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketPD PARSONS, ALPHEUS C WAS PRESENT FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket--DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT FIRST OFFENSE 2ND DEGREE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT FIRST OFFENSE 2ND DEGREE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT FIRST OFFENSE 2ND DEGREE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/19/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/19/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(1) - GRAND THEFT ($750 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(1) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING $750; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 3000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 812.014(2)(C)(1) - GRAND THEFT ($750 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000); STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/19/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less