Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 17:04:36 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS HUTT, SAMANTHA MARY

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HUTT, SAMANTHA MARY. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRAUSE, DEBRA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********660A

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HUTT, SAMANTHA MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/28/2021

03/01/2021: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/28/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 03/31/2021 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: KRAUSE, DEBRA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $50.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $50.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • FinancialType: FEE - AFPDFEE; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED 03/01/2021; Fine Date: 03/04/2021; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 03/08/2021; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR NINETY (90) DAYS TO FILE MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPY OF INFORMATION OR INDICTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketPLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketREQUEST & ORDER GRANTING PRE-TRIAL RELEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPD BRIAN MASSEY WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket--APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU VIA MICROSOFT TEAMS WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 03/01/2021 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - STATUS: NOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(2) - BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(2) - BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; OFFENSE DATE: 02/28/2021; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(2) - BATTERY CAUSE BODILY HARM DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRETTIS, BLAISE