This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 19:28:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS HOLTSCLAW, SCOTT DWIGHT

Case Summary

On 02/02/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HOLTSCLAW, SCOTT DWIGHT. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCHOTT, FREDERIC and SCHOTT, FREDERIC M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********480A

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCHOTT, FREDERIC

SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HOLTSCLAW, SCOTT DWIGHT

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

 

Court Documents

NO INFORMATION FILED

02/13/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409711

02/14/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409711

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409711 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

02/04/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409711 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/01/2020

02/02/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/01/2020

INTAKE SHEET

02/02/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY OLIVIA YERGEY, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE HERR PRESENT

02/02/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY OLIVIA YERGEY, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE HERR PRESENT

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 28, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/05/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 28, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

02/02/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: X60409711

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $0.00; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $0.00; Total Amount Ordered: $50.00; Total Lien Amount: $0; Total Amount Waived: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - AFPDFEE; Comments: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED 02/02/2020; Fine Date: 02/05/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 02/09/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $50.00 WAIVED/DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 28, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409711 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY NOT APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[C] - DATE: 02/28/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY OLIVIA YERGEY, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE HERR PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); OFFENSE DATE: 02/01/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY- TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/13/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less