This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 14:19:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS HILL JR, JIMMEL RODERICK

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HILL JR, JIMMEL RODERICK. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J and CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********192A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

HILL, JIMMEL RODERICK

Sanford, FL 32771

HILL JR, JIMMEL RODERICK

Sanford, FL 32771

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

GORTON, CHRISTOPHER

101 Bush Blvd

Sanford, FL 32773

 

Court Documents

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

06/25/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

06/10/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

05/13/2020: MINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

05/14/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

04/16/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

04/09/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (3)

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (4)

04/02/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (4)

RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

03/27/2020: RESP NOTC DISC/DMD NOTC CLAIM ALIBI/DMD INT ISS SUBP DUC TEC

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

03/24/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

02/25/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/30/2020

01/30/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 01/30/2020

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: AA20614438 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: FRANKLIN BAIL

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: AA20614438 - AMT: $2000 - NAME: FRANKLIN BAIL

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

01/23/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 25, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

CITATION FILED AD3P1CE

01/19/2020: CITATION FILED AD3P1CE

SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION

01/21/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

01/19/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

01/19/2020: MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 07/22/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5D CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketPRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (1)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingTYPE: DOCKET SOUNDING; DATE / TIME: 06/10/2020 / 0830 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 5D CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR DOCKET SOUNDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCOURT GRANTED DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketALL CHARGES: DEFENDANT CONTINUED ON BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketDOCKET SOUNDING CONTINUED TO 07/22/2020 AT 0900AM IN COURTROOM 5D, AT CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPD GORTON, CHRISTOPHER WAS PRESENT FOR DOCKET SOUNDING

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE MARLENE ALVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON WAS PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION FILED AD3P1CE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - INFRACTIONS - 316.089(1) - FAIL TO DRIVE IN SINGLE LANE; ARREST DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.089(1) - FAIL TO DRIVE IN SINGLE LANE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: AD3P1CE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: INFRACTIONS - 316.089(1) - FAIL TO DRIVE IN SINGLE LANE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF COCAINE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - DRUGS-POSSESS COCAINE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 2000.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 893.13(6)(A) - POSSESSION OF COCAINE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 01/30/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less