This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 10/18/2020 at 17:03:16 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS HARRIS, MAY FLOR

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HARRIS, MAY FLOR. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********055A

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HARRIS, MAY FLOR

Lake Mary, FL 32746

 

Court Documents

1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

09/24/2020: 1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

NO INFORMATION FILED

09/29/2020: NO INFORMATION FILED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

09/24/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNO INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 09/24/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 10/23/2020 AT 0900AM IN COURTROOM 1A WITH JUDGE MARK E HERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket--DEFENDANT RELEASED ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(0)BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) 784.03(1)(A)(1) M-1:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNO VIOLENT CONTACT WITH MICHAEL HARRIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDO NOT POSSESS WEAPONS OR FIRE ARMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCORRECTED TO DELETE NO CONTACT CONDITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY VALEDA ADULOJU WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS ADVISED OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT WAS PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketMINUTES FOR FIRST APPEARANCE BEFORE JUDGE FREDERIC M. SCHOTT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 09/24/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - STATUS: NOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); OFFENSE DATE: 09/23/2020; STATUS: ARREST; RELEASE STATUS: RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 784.03(1)(A)(1) - BATTERY - TOUCH OR STRIKE (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE); STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 09/29/2020; FINAL ACTION: DROPPED/ABANDONED

    Read MoreRead Less