This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/22/2020 at 13:05:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS HAFIDI, FADILA

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HAFIDI, FADILA. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********320A

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

HAFIDI, FADILA

Lake Mary, FL 32746

OCEAN, FADILA

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN DATE:02/17/2020 / AMT $65.00 / BOOK# 9539 / PAGE# 1864/1865

03/17/2020: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN DATE:02/17/2020 / AMT $65.00 / BOOK# 9539 / PAGE# 1864/1865

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

02/17/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409366

02/18/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409366

JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS - PETIT THEFT

02/17/2020: JUDGMENT, SENTENCE AND FINGERPRINTS - PETIT THEFT

RECORDED JUDGMENT

02/19/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/05/2020

02/05/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/05/2020

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409367

02/06/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409367

INTAKE SHEET

01/22/2020: INTAKE SHEET

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409367 - AMT: $500 - NAME: FREEDOM US

01/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409367 - AMT: $500 - NAME: FREEDOM US

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409366 - AMT: $500 - NAME: FREEDOM US

01/24/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409366 - AMT: $500 - NAME: FREEDOM US

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 17, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/27/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 17, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/21/2020

01/22/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/21/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT LIEN DATE:02/17/2020 / AMT $65.00 / BOOK# 9539 / PAGE# 1864/1865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409366

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 02/17/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $263.00; Total Amount Paid: $263.00; Total Balance Due: $0.00; Total Amount Ordered: $263.00; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 PETIT THEFT; Comments: $60ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 02/17/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $10CLERK; $20CSTF; 02/17/2020; Fine Date: 02/17/2020; Total Assesment: $213.00; Fail Comply: 07/16/2020; Interest: $0.00; Last Paid: 02/17/2020; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $213.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PROSFEE; Comments: $50.00 02/17/2020; Fine Date: 02/17/2020; Total Assesment: $50.00; Fail Comply: 07/16/2020; Interest: $0.00; Last Paid: 02/17/2020; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $50.00; Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialLien Date: 02/17/2020; Lien Amount: $65.00; Lien percent: 6.83; O.R. Book: 9539; O.R. Page: 1864/1865; County Recorded: SEMINOLE; Satisfaction Date: 03/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 02/17/2020; Receipt Number: 227413; Amount: $50.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 02/17/2020; Receipt Number: 227413; Amount: $213.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[F] - DATE: 02/17/2020 - TIME: 0900AM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409366 - AMT: $500 - NAME: FREEDOM US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409367 - AMT: $500 - NAME: FREEDOM US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • HearingTYPE: FIRST APPEARANCE; DATE / TIME: 01/22/2020 / 0200 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - J2 CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: SCHOTT, FREDERIC M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFIRST APPEARANCE SET - DATE: 01/22/2020 - TIME: 0200PM - CTRM: J2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500 X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/21/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 843.02 - RESIST OFFICER- OBSTRUCT WO VIOLENCE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL DECISION DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: NO ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (02/17/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPERT; OFFENSE DATE: 01/21/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/05/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; DECISION DATE: 02/17/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 02/17/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 02/17/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: HERR, MARK E; SENTENCE DESC: $213.00 TOTAL/6 MONTHS PROB; PROBATION LENGTH: 6 MONTH(S); COURT COST: $ 213.00

    Read MoreRead Less