This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/25/2020 at 15:27:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GWINN, KEONDRE N

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GWINN, KEONDRE N. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERR, MARK E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********302A

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERR, MARK E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GWINN, KEONDRE N

Orlando, FL 32829

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

07/02/2020: 1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786810

07/06/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786810

AGREEMENT PAY $80.60 MO 08/02/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

07/02/2020: AGREEMENT PAY $80.60 MO 08/02/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

RECEIPT 2020-168-009049 DISTRIBUTED TO 4 UFNS, TOTAL $378.28 PAID

07/28/2020: RECEIPT 2020-168-009049 DISTRIBUTED TO 4 UFNS, TOTAL $378.28 PAID

RECORDED JUDGMENT

07/31/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE JUL 02, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

04/22/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE JUL 02, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT APR 29, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

03/25/2020: AMENDED NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT APR 29, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

02/19/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MARK E HERR

WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ISSUED - DATE: 02/20/2020

02/19/2020: WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ISSUED - DATE: 02/20/2020

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 25, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

02/20/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 25, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/10/2020

02/10/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 02/10/2020

CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409352

01/27/2020: CERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: X60409352

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409352 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

01/22/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: X60409352 - AMT: $500 - NAME: MAGIC CA

TURNED IN BY BONDSMAN - WITH SURRENDER FORM

01/24/2020: TURNED IN BY BONDSMAN - WITH SURRENDER FORM

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/20/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/19/2020

01/20/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/19/2020

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 19, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

01/23/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT FEB 19, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTORNEY BLAISE TRETTIS

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/28/2020; Receipt Number: 293804; Amount: $50.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/28/2020; Receipt Number: 293804; Amount: $50.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/28/2020; Receipt Number: 293804; Amount: $228.28;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/28/2020; Receipt Number: 293804; Amount: $50.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT 2020-168-009049 DISTRIBUTED TO 4 UFNS, TOTAL $378.28 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MAIL RETURNED AND REMAILED MINUTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISCHARGE BOND - BOND#: U620786810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • HearingTYPE: PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; DATE / TIME: 07/02/2020 / 0900 AM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 4C CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: HERR, MARK E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $378.28; Total Amount Paid: $378.28; Total Balance Due: $0.00; Total Amount Ordered: $378.00; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.111 - POSSESSION OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE BY PERSON UNDER TWENTY-ONE DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (07/02/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.111 - LIQUOR-POSSESS- BY PERSON UNDER 21 YEARS OF AGE FIRST OFFENS; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 500.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.111 - POSSESSION OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE BY PERSON UNDER TWENTY-ONE; STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 02/10/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 562.111 - POSSESSION OF ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE BY PERSON UNDER TWENTY-ONE; DECISION DATE: 07/02/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 07/02/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/02/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: HERR, MARK E; SENTENCE DESC: $228.00 TOTAL/JAIL 54 DAYS; CONFINEMENT TYPE: COUNTY JAIL; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 54 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 1 MONTH(S)24 DAYS(S); COURT COST: $ 228.00

    Read MoreRead Less