This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 01:30:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GRAY, CURTIS MARQUIES

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRAY, CURTIS MARQUIES. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J and CHASE, MELANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********274A

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RECKSIEDLER, JESSICA J

CHASE, MELANIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GRAY, CURTIS MARQUIES

Deltona, FL 32725

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

07/23/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

07/28/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

05/12/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT ARRAIGNMENT

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

05/19/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 03/19/2020

03/19/2020: INFORMATION FILED - DATE: 03/19/2020

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

03/24/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

03/24/2020: 1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JESSICA J RECKSIEDLER

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAY 19, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

03/25/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAY 19, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

03/25/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - NAME: TRETTIS, BLAISE

BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE5133304 - AMT: $3000 - NAME: 1213

01/31/2020: BOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE5133304 - AMT: $3000 - NAME: 1213

NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 24, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

02/03/2020: NOTICE FOR ARRAIGNMENT MAR 24, 2020 AT 01:30 PM PRINTED

CITATION FILED AD1WVFE

01/30/2020: CITATION FILED AD1WVFE

SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION

01/30/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION

CITATION(S): AD1WVEE

01/30/2020: CITATION(S): AD1WVEE

ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/29/2020

01/30/2020: ARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/29/2020

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 09/22/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • HearingTYPE: ARRAIGNMENT; DATE / TIME: 07/28/2020 / 0130 PM; LOCATION: COURTROOM - 1A CRIMINAL JUSTICE CENTER 101 ESLINGER WAY SANFORD, FL 32773 Phone: (407) 665-4450; JUDGE: CHASE, MELANIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketCOURT GRANTED DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketALL CHARGES: DEFENDANT CONTINUED ON BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • Docket--JUSTICE BUILDING BEFORE JUDGE MELANIE CHASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT CONTINUED TO 09/22/2020 AT 0130PM IN COURTROOM 1A, AT CRIMINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE PREVIOUSLY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketPD SCOTT STERLING WAS PRESENT FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketSTATE ATTORNEY TYRONE POLK/RICHARD FARMER WAS PRESENT FOR ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENT SET[M] - DATE: 03/24/2020 - TIME: 0130PM - CTRM: 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND SLIP - TYPE: SU - BOND#: PSE5133304 - AMT: $3000 - NAME: 1213

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketSET BONDSMAN - AMT: $3000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION(S): AD1WVEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCITATION AD1WVFE TRANSFERRED FROM TRAFFIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL CITATION INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCITATION FILED AD1WVFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 0 - N/A, LEVEL IS INFRACTION, COUNTY, MUNICIPAL ORDINANCE INFRACTIONS - 316.074(1) - VIOLATION OF TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE; ARREST DETAILS: N/A, LEVEL IS INFRACTION, COUNTY, MUNICIPAL ORDINANCE INFRACTIONS - 316.074(1) - VIOLATION OF TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE; OFFENSE DATE: 01/29/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 0.00; CITATION NUMBER: AD1WVFE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: N/A, LEVEL IS INFRACTION, COUNTY, MUNICIPAL ORDINANCE INFRACTIONS - 316.074(1) - VIOLATION OF TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE; STATUS: SAME; FINAL ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(5) - FELONY DRIVING WHILE LICENSE REVOKED (HABITUAL OFFENDER) DISPOSITION - (); ARREST DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(5) - DRIVING WHILE LICENSE SUSPENDED OR REVOKED; OFFENSE DATE: 01/29/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 3000.00; CITATION NUMBER: AD1WVEE; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 3rd DEGREE FELONY - 322.34(5) - FELONY DRIVING WHILE LICENSE REVOKED (HABITUAL OFFENDER); STATUS: SAME; FILE DATE: 03/19/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED

    Read MoreRead Less