This case was last updated from Seminole County Courts on 07/23/2020 at 14:29:47 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS GOMEZ JR, ISMAEL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GOMEZ JR, ISMAEL. This case was filed in Seminole County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Seminole, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, JERRI and COLLINS, JERRI L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********294A

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Seminole County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Seminole, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, JERRI

COLLINS, JERRI L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GOMEZ JR, ISMAEL

Casselberry, FL 32707

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

TRETTIS, BLAISE

101 Eslinger Way, 3Rd Floor

Sanford, FL 32772

 

Court Documents

RECORDED JUDGMENT

07/16/2020: RECORDED JUDGMENT

MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

06/25/2020: MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

07/02/2020: MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

07/02/2020: 1ST AMENDED MINUTES FOR MOTION BEFORE JUDGE JERRI L COLLINS

AGREEMENT PAY $99.08 MO 07/30/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

07/02/2020: AGREEMENT PAY $99.08 MO 07/30/2020 FEE - AMT: $25.00

MOTION TO DISMISS FAILURE TO APPEAR AND RECALL BENCH WARRANT

06/26/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS FAILURE TO APPEAR AND RECALL BENCH WARRANT

WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

03/09/2020: WITNESS SUBPOENA RETURNED (1)

MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

03/12/2020: MINUTES FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 16, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

03/13/2020: NOTICE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE APR 16, 2020 AT 09:00 AM PRINTED

NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

03/03/2020: NOTICE OF INTENT TO ISSUE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

03/05/2020: SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/05/2020: WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

AMENDED INFORMATION - DATE: 02/24/2020

02/24/2020: AMENDED INFORMATION - DATE: 02/24/2020

PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

02/26/2020: PRAECIPE WITNESS SUBPOENA ISSUED (5)

MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

02/11/2020: MINUTES FOR ARRAIGNMENT BEFORE JUDGE JERRI COLLINS

INTAKE SHEET

01/19/2020: INTAKE SHEET

COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

01/19/2020: COUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

01/19/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENCY APPROVED FEE - AMT: $50.00

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketBOND DISCHARGED - BOND#: X60409143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*** CORRECTED MINUTES ***OF 7/2/20 TO REFLECT BOND WAS RELEASED BOND #X60409143. NUNC PRO TUNC 7/2/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialPayment Date: 07/21/2020; Receipt Number: 289448; Amount: $7.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWARRANT CANCELLED/RECALLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT 2020-168-008992 BOND X60409143, $7.00 PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORDED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • FinancialType: FEE - PAYFEE; Comments: AGREEMENT PAY $99.08 MO 07/30/2020; Fine Date: 07/06/2020; Total Assesment: $25.00; Fail Comply: 07/30/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketBOND RE INSTATED - BOND#: X60409143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • FinancialTotal Amount Due: $495.44; Total Amount Paid: $0.00; Total Balance Due: $495.44; Total Amount Ordered: $495.44; Total Lien Amount: $65.00; Total Amount Waived: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • FinancialType: CRT COST PARTIAL LIEN - 1 CNT#1 PETIT THEFT; Comments: $60ADDCC; $65ADDCC(JUDGMENT 07/02/2020); $50CCTF; $3CJT; $2CJE; $3TEEN COURT; $10CLERK; $20CSTF; 07/02/2020; Fine Date: 07/02/2020; Total Assesment: $213.00; Fail Comply: 08/01/2020; Interest: $0.00; Adjustment: $0.00; Total Paid: $0.00; Balance: $213.00

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketASSIGN ATTORNEY - NAME: PUBLIC DEFENDER/PROVISIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE FOUND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ADVISED OF RIGHTS BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT PRESENT FOR FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOUNTY COURT MINUTES STATE ATTORNEY ROBERT SUTTON, PUBLIC DEFENDER KRAMER AND JUDGE ALVA PRESENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • Docket$50 APPLICATION OF CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FEE SHALL BE PAID TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN 7 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • DocketBOND CONDITIONS PROBABLE CAUSE AS TO PETIT THEFT M2 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINTAKE SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT - DATE: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE 1 - 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT DISPOSITION - ADJUDICATED GUILTY (07/02/2020); ARREST DETAILS: 1st DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(2)(E) - LARC-RETAIL THEFT/SHOPLIFTING PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROPERT; OFFENSE DATE: 01/18/2020; STATUS: ARREST; BOND AMOUNT SET: 263.00; PROSECUTION DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; STATUS: REDUCED; FILE DATE: 02/03/2020; FINAL ACTION: FILED; COURT DETAILS: 2nd DEGREE MISDEMEANOR - 812.014(3)(A) - PETIT THEFT; DECISION DATE: 07/02/2020; ACTION: ADJUDICATED GUILTY; TRIAL TYPE: NONE; FINAL PLEA: NOLO-CONTENDERE; SENTENCE DETAILS; IMPOSED DATED: 07/02/2020; EFFECTIVE DATE: 07/02/2020; JUDGE AT SENTENCING: COLLINS, JERRI L; SENTENCE DESC: $213.00 TOTAL/JAIL 2 DAYS; CONFINEMENT TYPE: COUNTY JAIL; CREDIT TIME SERVED: 2 DAYS(S); LENGTH MAX CONFINEMENT: 2 DAYS(S); COURT COST: $ 213.00

    Read MoreRead Less